AL SB56 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on June 1 2023 - 75% progression
Action: 2023-06-01 - Enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on June 1 2023 - 75% progression
Action: 2023-06-01 - Enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Relating to public K-12 schools; to add Section 16-39-13 to the Code of Alabama 1975; to require local boards of education to install, maintain, and operate video cameras in certain self-contained classrooms providing special education services, if the funding to do so is available; and to provide protections for the use of video recordings.
Title
Relating to public K-12 schools; to add Section 16-39-13 to the Code of Alabama 1975; to require local boards of education to install, maintain, and operate video cameras in certain self-contained classrooms providing special education services, if the funding to do so is available; and to provide protections for the use of video recordings.
Sponsors
Sen. Arthur Orr [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-05-31 - House - Read a Third Time and Pass as Amended (Y: 103 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-05-31 - House - Adopt E0ZX99-1 (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-03-23 - Senate - Read A Third Time And Passed As Amended (Y: 30 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-03-23 - Senate - Adopt (Y: 30 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-03-23 - Senate - Adopt (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-05-31 - House - Adopt E0ZX99-1 (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-03-23 - Senate - Read A Third Time And Passed As Amended (Y: 30 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-03-23 - Senate - Adopt (Y: 30 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-03-23 - Senate - Adopt (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-01 | Senate | Enrolled |
2023-06-01 | Senate | Concur In and Adopt |
2023-05-31 | House | Read a Third Time and Pass as Amended |
2023-05-31 | House | Adopt E0ZX99-1 |
2023-05-31 | House | Carry Over to the Call of the Chair |
2023-05-31 | House | On Third Reading in Second House |
2023-04-19 | House | Read Second Time in Second House |
2023-04-19 | House | Reported Out of Committee in Second House |
2023-04-19 | House | Reported Favorably from House Education Policy |
2023-04-19 | House | Amendment/Substitute by House Education Policy E0ZX99-1 |
2023-04-04 | House | Referred to Committee to House Education Policy |
2023-04-04 | Senate | Read First Time in Second House |
2023-04-04 | Senate | Amendment/Substitute by Senate Education Policy 1GJ93Z-1 |
2023-03-23 | Senate | Read A Third Time And Passed As Amended |
2023-03-23 | Senate | Adopt NN0CT8-1 |
2023-03-23 | Senate | Adopt XVCT7E-1 |
2023-03-23 | Senate | Adopt |
2023-03-23 | Senate | On Third Reading in House of Origin |
2023-03-21 | Senate | Read Second Time in House of Origin |
2023-03-21 | Senate | Reported Out of Committee in House of Origin |
2023-03-21 | Senate | Reported Favorably from Senate Education Policy |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to Senate Education Policy |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Read First Time in House of Origin |