AL SB55 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-03-12 - Pending third reading on day 13 Favorable from Insurance
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Insurance Dept., service contract law, expenses related to examination by Commissioner of Insurance, Vehicle Protection Products Act, fees deposited in Insurance Dept. Fund, expense related to exam by commissioner, Sec. 8-33-14 added.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Insurance Dept., service contract law, expenses related to examination by Commissioner of Insurance, Vehicle Protection Products Act, fees deposited in Insurance Dept. Fund, expense related to exam by commissioner, Sec. 8-33-14 added.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-05 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - Senate - Shelnutt motion to Adopt (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-12HousePending third reading on day 13 Favorable from Insurance
2020-03-12HouseRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2020-03-05HouseRead for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Insurance
2020-03-05SenateEngrossed
2020-03-05SenateMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 281
2020-03-05SenateShelnutt motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 280
2020-03-05SenateBanking and Insurance first Substitute Offered
2020-03-05SenateThird Reading Passed
2020-02-13SenateRead for the second time and placed on the calendar with 1 substitute and
2020-02-04SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Banking and Insurance

Subjects


Alabama State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback