AL SB55 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 15 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-15 - Conference Committee on SB55 2018RS first Substitute Offered
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Driver's licenses, restricted driver license authorized based on hardship, Sec. 32-6-12.1 am'd.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Driver's licenses, restricted driver license authorized based on hardship, Sec. 32-6-12.1 am'd.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-15 - House - Beckman motion to Concur In and Adopt (Y: 95 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-03-08 - Senate - Chambliss motion to Concur In and Adopt (Y: 26 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2018-03-06 - House - Beckman motion to Accede (Y: 88 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2018-03-06 - Senate - Chambliss motion to Non Concur and Appoint Conference Committee (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2018-03-01 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 88 N: 5 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2018-03-01 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 82 N: 8 NV: 2 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2018-02-01 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 26 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2018-02-01 - Senate - Chambliss motion to Adopt (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2018-01-30 - Senate - Chambliss motion to Adopt (Y: 19 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2018-01-23 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 67 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-01-23 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 70 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-01-23 - House - Clouse motion to Table (Y: 73 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 23) [PASS]
2018-01-23 - House - Clouse motion to Table (Y: 74 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 23) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-15SenateConference Committee on SB55 2018RS first Substitute Offered
2018-03-15SenateAssigned Act No. 2018-289.
2018-03-15SenateEnrolled
2018-03-15HouseSignature Requested
2018-03-15SenateConcurred in Conference Report
2018-03-15HouseBeckman motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 799
2018-03-15HouseConference Report Concurrence Requested
2018-03-08SenateChambliss motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 754
2018-03-08SenateConference Report
2018-03-08SenateConference Committee Appointed
2018-03-06HouseBeckman motion to Accede adopted Roll Call 627 House appoints Beckman, Pettus and England
2018-03-06HouseConference Committee Requested
2018-03-06SenateChambliss motion to Non Concur and Appoint Conference Committee adopted Roll Call 597 P&PO appoints Chambliss, Williams, Phil and Smitherman
2018-03-06SenateConcurrence Requested
2018-03-01HouseMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 575
2018-03-01HouseMotion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 574
2018-03-01HouseWadsworth Amendment Offered
2018-03-01HouseThird Reading Passed
2018-02-22HouseRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2018-02-01HouseRead for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Public Safety and Homeland Security
2018-02-01SenateEngrossed
2018-02-01SenateMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 276
2018-02-01SenateChambliss motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 275
2018-02-01SenateChambliss Amendment Offered
2018-02-01SenateThird Reading Passed
2018-01-30SenateChambliss motion to Carry Over to the Call of the Chair adopted Voice Vote
2018-01-30SenateChambliss motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 220
2018-01-30SenateChambliss first Substitute Offered
2018-01-30SenateThird Reading Carried Over to Call of the Chair
2018-01-18SenateReported from Judiciary as Favorable
2018-01-09SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Judiciary

Subjects


Alabama State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/Alison/SESSBillStatusResult.aspx?BILL=SB55&WIN_TYPE=SELECTED_STATUS
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2018RS/PrintFiles/SB55-int.pdf
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2018RS/PrintFiles/SB55-eng.pdf
Amendmenthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2018RS/PrintFiles/190622-1.pdf
Amendmenthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2018RS/PrintFiles/190993-1.pdf
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=584497&VOTE=220&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1070&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=585442&VOTE=275&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1070&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=585443&VOTE=276&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1070&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=582673&VOTE=76&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1070&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=582700&VOTE=75&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1070&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=582702&VOTE=77&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1070&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=582760&VOTE=78&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1070&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=592227&VOTE=574&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1070&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=592228&VOTE=575&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1070&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=592695&VOTE=597&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1070&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=593293&VOTE=627&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1070&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=594491&VOTE=754&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1070&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=596329&VOTE=799&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1070&AMDSUB= 

Bill Comments

feedback