AL SB54 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-25 - Assigned Act No. 2019-98.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Insurance Data Security Law, Insurance Commissioner to regulate, reports to Insurance Dept., licensee to implement information security programs, oversight of third-party providers, reports re cybersecurity events, criminal penalties, Secs. 10A-20-6.16, 27-21A-23 am'd.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Insurance Data Security Law, Insurance Commissioner to regulate, reports to Insurance Dept., licensee to implement information security programs, oversight of third-party providers, reports re cybersecurity events, criminal penalties, Secs. 10A-20-6.16, 27-21A-23 am'd.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-23 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - Senate - Waggoner motion to Adopt (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - Senate - Waggoner motion to Adopt (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-25SenateAssigned Act No. 2019-98.
2019-04-25SenateBanking and Insurance first Amendment Offered
2019-04-25HouseSignature Requested
2019-04-25SenateEnrolled
2019-04-23SenatePassed Second House
2019-04-23HouseMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 337
2019-04-23HouseThird Reading Passed
2019-04-18HouseRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2019-04-03HouseRead for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Technology and Research
2019-04-03SenateEngrossed
2019-04-02SenateMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 87
2019-04-02SenateWaggoner motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 86
2019-04-02SenateWaggoner Amendment Offered
2019-04-02SenateWaggoner motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 85
2019-04-02SenateBanking and Insurance Amendment Offered
2019-04-02SenateThird Reading Passed
2019-03-20SenateRead for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment
2019-03-05SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Banking and Insurance

Subjects


Alabama State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/Alison/SESSBillStatusResult.aspx?BILL=SB54&WIN_TYPE=SELECTED_STATUS
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2019RS/PrintFiles/SB54-int.pdf
Amendmenthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2019RS/PrintFiles/198004-2.pdf
Amendmenthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2019RS/PrintFiles/198256-1.pdf
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=607199&VOTE=85&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1074&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=607201&VOTE=86&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1074&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=607202&VOTE=87&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1074&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=612354&VOTE=337&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1074&AMDSUB= 

Bill Comments

feedback