AL SB53 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-09 - Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Banking and Insurance
Pending: Senate Banking and Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-09 - Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Banking and Insurance
Pending: Senate Banking and Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Appraisers and appraisal managerial companies, fees charged to be disclosed separately and distinctly, Alabama Real Estate Appraisers Board may adopt rules
Title
Appraisers and appraisal managerial companies, fees charged to be disclosed separately and distinctly, Alabama Real Estate Appraisers Board may adopt rules
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-21 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2018-03-06 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 69 Abs: 12) [FAIL]
2018-02-20 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-02-01 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2018-02-01 - Senate - Scofield motion to Adopt (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2018-03-06 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 69 Abs: 12) [FAIL]
2018-02-20 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-02-01 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2018-02-01 - Senate - Scofield motion to Adopt (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-09 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Banking and Insurance |