AL SB53 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 2 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-28 - Indefinitely Postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 2 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-28 - Indefinitely Postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Local bills, advertisement or posting prior to introduction, procedures, amendment further provided for, introduction limited, Sec. 106 (Recompiled Constitution of Alabama of 1901) am'd., const. amend.
Title
Local bills, advertisement or posting prior to introduction, procedures, amendment further provided for, introduction limited, Sec. 106 (Recompiled Constitution of Alabama of 1901) am'd., const. amend.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-28 | Senate | Indefinitely Postponed |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Albritton motion to Carry Over adopted Voice Vote |
2016-03-10 | Senate | County and Municipal Government first Substitute Offered |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Third Reading Carried Over |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar with 1 substitute and |
2016-02-02 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on County and Municipal Government |