AL SB53 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 2 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-18 - Boards, Agencies and Commissions first Amendment Offered
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 2 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-18 - Boards, Agencies and Commissions first Amendment Offered
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Cosmetology, Board of, expanded to include barbers, renamed, Board of Cosmetology and Barbering, Secs. 34-7B-1 to 34-7B-27, inclusive, added; Secs. 34-7A-1 to 34-7A-25, inclusive, repealed
Title
Cosmetology, Board of, expanded to include barbers, renamed, Board of Cosmetology and Barbering, Secs. 34-7B-1 to 34-7B-27, inclusive, added; Secs. 34-7A-1 to 34-7A-25, inclusive, repealed
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-04 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 26 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2013-04-04 - Senate - Holley motion to Adopt (Y: 29 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-04-04 - Senate - Rules Committee Petition to Cease Debate (Y: 23 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-04-04 - Senate - Holley motion to Adopt (Y: 29 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-04-04 - Senate - Rules Committee Petition to Cease Debate (Y: 23 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-18 | House | Boards, Agencies and Commissions first Amendment Offered |
2013-04-18 | House | Pending third reading on day 23 Favorable from Boards, Agencies and Commissions with 1 amendment |
2013-04-18 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment |
2013-04-04 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Boards, Agencies and Commissions |
2013-04-04 | Senate | Engrossed |
2013-04-02 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 292 |
2013-04-02 | Senate | Holley motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 291 |
2013-04-02 | Senate | Holley Amendment Offered |
2013-04-02 | Senate | Rules Committee Petition to Cease Debate adopted Roll Call 290 |
2013-04-02 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2013-02-07 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2013-02-05 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Governmental Affairs |