AL SB53 | 2011 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 9 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-09 - Delivered to Governor at 11: 58 on June 9, 2011
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Infants and incompetents, power of attorney, Uniform Power of Attorney Act, Sec. 26-1A-101 to 26-1A-123, inclusive, 26-1A-201 to 26-1A-217, inclusive, 26-1A-301, 26-1A-302, 26-1A-401 to 26-1A-404, inclusive, added; Sec. 26-1-2 am'd.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Infants and incompetents, power of attorney, Uniform Power of Attorney Act, Sec. 26-1A-101 to 26-1A-123, inclusive, 26-1A-201 to 26-1A-217, inclusive, 26-1A-301, 26-1A-302, 26-1A-401 to 26-1A-404, inclusive, added; Sec. 26-1-2 am'd.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2011-06-09 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-03-24 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-03-24 - Senate - Motion to Adopt (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-03-24 - Senate - Motion to Adopt (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2011-06-09 Delivered to Governor at 11: 58 on June 9, 2011
2011-06-09 Assigned Act No. 2011-683.
2011-06-09 Signature Requested
2011-06-09 Enrolled
2011-06-09 Passed Second House
2011-06-09 Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1184
2011-06-09 Third Reading Passed
2011-04-14 Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
2011-03-29 Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Judiciary
2011-03-24 Engrossed
2011-03-24 Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 118
2011-03-24 Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 117
2011-03-24 Orr No. 2 Amendment Offered.
2011-03-24 Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 116
2011-03-24 Orr Amendment Offered
2011-03-24 Orr motion to Table adopted Voice Vote
2011-03-24 Judiciary Amendment Offered
2011-03-24 Third Reading Passed
2011-03-03 Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment
2011-03-01 Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Judiciary

Subjects


Alabama State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/SESSBillResult.ASPX?WIN_TYPE=BillResult&BILL=SB53
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2011RS/PrintFiles/SB53-int.pdf
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2011RS/PrintFiles/SB53-eng.pdf
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2011RS/PrintFiles/SB53-enr.pdf
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=399327&VOTE=116&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1058&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=399355&VOTE=117&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1058&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=399356&VOTE=118&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1058&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=422257&VOTE=1184&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1058&AMDSUB= 

Bill Comments

feedback