AL SB52 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 25 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-27 - Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 25 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-27 - Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Municipal corporations, ordinances, issuance of summons and complaint in lieu of custodial arrest, further provided for, Sec. 11-45-9.1 am'd.
Title
Municipal corporations, ordinances, issuance of summons and complaint in lieu of custodial arrest, further provided for, Sec. 11-45-9.1 am'd.
Sponsors
Sen. Tim Melson [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-02-25 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - Senate - Motion to Adopt (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - Senate - Motion to Adopt (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - Senate - Motion to Adopt (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - Senate - Motion to Adopt (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - Senate - Motion to Adopt (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - Senate - Motion to Adopt (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-27 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Judiciary |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Engrossed |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 213 |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 212 |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Melson Amendment Offered |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 211 |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 210 |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Judiciary Amendment Offered |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Judiciary Amendment Offered |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 2 amendments |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Judiciary |