AL SB511 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 12 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-09 - Indefinitely Postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 12 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-09 - Indefinitely Postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Economic Development, tax incentives for certain qualifying projects developing or expanding in state, job creation, retention component, Alabama Development Office and Finance Director to recommend to Governor to approve the project, Alabama Job Creation and Retention Act
Title
Economic Development, tax incentives for certain qualifying projects developing or expanding in state, job creation, retention component, Alabama Development Office and Finance Director to recommend to Governor to approve the project, Alabama Job Creation and Retention Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-09 | Indefinitely Postponed | |
2012-04-26 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar | |
2012-04-19 | Referred to Committee on Finance and Taxation Education | |
2012-04-12 | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Job Creation and Economic Development |