AL SB503 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 21 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-03 - Indefinitely Postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 21 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-03 - Indefinitely Postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Medical Examiners, Board, and Medical Licensure Commissions, rules, certified, reviewed by Legislative Reference Service for anticompetitive effect, further review by joint committee, Sec. 41-22-22.1 added
Title
Medical Examiners, Board, and Medical Licensure Commissions, rules, certified, reviewed by Legislative Reference Service for anticompetitive effect, further review by joint committee, Sec. 41-22-22.1 added
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-05-28 - Senate - Holley motion to Adopt (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-03 | Senate | Indefinitely Postponed |
2015-05-28 | Senate | Holley motion to Carry Over to the Call of the Chair adopted Voice Vote |
2015-05-28 | Senate | Holley motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 1286 |
2015-05-28 | Senate | Holley Amendment Offered |
2015-05-28 | Senate | Third Reading Carried Over to Call of the Chair |
2015-05-28 | Senate | Holley motion to Carry Over to the Call of the Chair adopted Voice Vote |
2015-05-28 | Senate | Third Reading Carried Over to Call of the Chair |
2015-05-26 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2015-05-21 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Governmental Affairs |