AL SB502 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 21 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-03 - Indefinitely Postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 21 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-03 - Indefinitely Postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Unified appropriations for state General Fund and Education Trust Fund; state revenue sources unearmarked, effective Jan. 1, 2017, constitutional amendment
Title
Unified appropriations for state General Fund and Education Trust Fund; state revenue sources unearmarked, effective Jan. 1, 2017, constitutional amendment
Sponsors
Sen. Gerald Dial [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-05-28 - Senate - Smitherman motion to Carry Over (Y: 10 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-03 | Senate | Indefinitely Postponed |
2015-05-28 | Senate | Marsh motion to Carry Over adopted Voice Vote |
2015-05-28 | Senate | Smitherman motion to Carry Over Lost Roll Call 1294 |
2015-05-28 | Senate | Third Reading Carried Over |
2015-05-26 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2015-05-21 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Finance and Taxation General Fund |