AL SB50 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 23 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-04-15 - Pending third reading on day 24 Favorable from State Government
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Legislature, President Pro Tem authorize to appoint designee to serve on Sunset Committee in his or her place, Sec. 41-20-4 am'd.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Legislature, President Pro Tem authorize to appoint designee to serve on Sunset Committee in his or her place, Sec. 41-20-4 am'd.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-23 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 238 (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - Senate - SBIR: Chambliss motion to Adopt Roll Call 237 (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-15HousePending third reading on day 24 Favorable from State Government
2021-04-15HouseRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2021-02-23HouseRead for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on State Government
2021-02-23SenateMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 238
2021-02-23SenateThird Reading Passed
2021-02-09SenateRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2021-02-02SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Governmental Affairs

Same As/Similar To

HB592 (Same As) 2021-04-15 - Pending third reading on day 24 Favorable from Boards, Agencies and Commissions

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
41204Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Alabama State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback