AL SB499 | 2012 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-16 - Delivered to Governor at 11:49 p.m. on May 16, 2012
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Athens State University, removed from under purview of State Board of Education and State Department of Postsecondary Education, board of trustees created, powers provided, president appointment, nomination committee, police officers, Sec. 16-60-110 am'd

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Athens State University, removed from under purview of State Board of Education and State Department of Postsecondary Education, board of trustees created, powers provided, president appointment, nomination committee, police officers, Sec. 16-60-110 am'd

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2012-05-18 - Senate - Marsh motion to Concur In and Adopt (Y: 29 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-05-17 - House - Williams (D) motion to Concur In and Adopt (Y: 100 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-05-12 - Senate - Holtzclaw motion to Concur In and Adopt (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2012-05-11 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 90 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2012-05-11 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2012-05-11 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2012-04-28 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2012-05-16 Delivered to Governor at 11:49 p.m. on May 16, 2012
2012-05-16 Assigned Act No. 2012-497.
2012-05-16 Signature Requested
2012-05-16 Enrolled
2012-05-16 Second House Concurs in Executive Amendment
2012-05-16 Williams (D) motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 1598
2012-05-16 House of Origin Concurs in Executive Amendment
2012-05-16 Marsh motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 1478
2012-05-16 Executive Amendment Offered
2012-05-16 Forwarded to Governor
2012-05-10 Enrolled
2012-05-10 Signature Requested
2012-05-10 Concurred in Second House Amendment
2012-05-10 Holtzclaw motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 1377
2012-05-10 Concurrence Requested
2012-05-10 Bracy intended to vote "Yea"
2012-05-10 Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1509
2012-05-10 Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 1508
2012-05-10 McCutcheon Amendment Offered
2012-05-10 Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 1507
2012-05-10 Education Policy Amendment Offered
2012-05-10 Third Reading Passed
2012-05-02 Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment
2012-04-26 Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Education Policy
2012-04-26 Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 802
2012-04-26 Third Reading Passed
2012-04-12 Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
2012-04-10 Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Finance and Taxation Education

Subjects


Alabama State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/SESSBillResult.ASPX?WIN_TYPE=BillResult&BILL=SB499
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2012RS/PrintFiles/SB499-int.pdf
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2012RS/PrintFiles/SB499-enr.pdf
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=441573&VOTE=802&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1059&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=448732&VOTE=1507&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1059&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=448746&VOTE=1508&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1059&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=448753&VOTE=1509&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1059&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=449015&VOTE=1377&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1059&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=450442&VOTE=1478&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1059&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=450800&VOTE=1598&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1059&AMDSUB= 

Bill Comments

feedback