AL SB49 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 8 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-01 - Pending third reading on day 17 Favorable from Ways and Means Education
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 8 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-01 - Pending third reading on day 17 Favorable from Ways and Means Education
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Neighborhood Infrastructure Authorities, municipalities, assessments for neighborhood infrastructure revitalization projects, income tax credits, expiration date deleted, tax credits extended until 2022, Secs. 11-71-11, 11-71-12 am'd.
Title
Neighborhood Infrastructure Authorities, municipalities, assessments for neighborhood infrastructure revitalization projects, income tax credits, expiration date deleted, tax credits extended until 2022, Secs. 11-71-11, 11-71-12 am'd.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-08 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-01 | House | Pending third reading on day 17 Favorable from Ways and Means Education |
2018-03-01 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2018-02-08 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Ways and Means Education |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 338 |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2018-01-23 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2018-01-09 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Finance and Taxation Education |