AL SB474 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 2 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-02 - Assigned Act No. 2014-311.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 2 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-02 - Assigned Act No. 2014-311.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Jackson Co., solid waste program, reimbursement of payments from General Fund relating to the operation of, administrative fee payable to co. commission authorized
Title
Jackson Co., solid waste program, reimbursement of payments from General Fund relating to the operation of, administrative fee payable to co. commission authorized
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-04-02 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 68 Abs: 10) [FAIL]
2014-03-21 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2014-03-21 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-02 | House | Assigned Act No. 2014-311. |
2014-04-02 | House | Signature Requested |
2014-04-02 | Senate | Enrolled |
2014-04-02 | Senate | Passed Second House |
2014-04-02 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1069 |
2014-04-02 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2014-04-01 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2014-03-20 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Local Legislation |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 960 |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2014-03-19 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation No. 1 |