AL SB473 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 9 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-09 - Forwarded to Governor at 11:55 a.m. on May 9, 2013
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 9 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-09 - Forwarded to Governor at 11:55 a.m. on May 9, 2013
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Mobile Co., alcoholic beverages, reasonable quantity purchased from military liquor or package stores, for active duty, active reserve status or retired Armed Forces allowed, civil penalties
Title
Mobile Co., alcoholic beverages, reasonable quantity purchased from military liquor or package stores, for active duty, active reserve status or retired Armed Forces allowed, civil penalties
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-05-09 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 63 Abs: 14) [FAIL]
2013-05-02 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 25 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-04-25 - Senate - Whatley to table Smitherman motion to rerefer (Y: 20 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2013-05-02 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 25 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-04-25 - Senate - Whatley to table Smitherman motion to rerefer (Y: 20 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-09 | House | Forwarded to Governor at 11:55 a.m. on May 9, 2013 |
2013-05-09 | House | Assigned Act No. 2013-262. |
2013-05-09 | House | Signature Requested |
2013-05-09 | Senate | Enrolled |
2013-05-09 | Senate | Passed Second House |
2013-05-09 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1163 |
2013-05-09 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2013-05-07 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2013-05-02 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Mobile County Legislation |
2013-05-02 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 779 |
2013-05-02 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2013-04-30 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2013-04-25 | Senate | Whatley to table Smitherman motion to rerefer adopted Roll Call 578 |
2013-04-25 | Senate | Smitherman motion to rerefer |
2013-04-25 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation No. 3 |