AL SB473 | 2010 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 22 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-22 - Forwarded to Executive Department on April 22, 2010
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Corrections Institution Finance Authority, issuance of additional bonds to acquire prison facility in Perry County and to provide additional bedspace in existing facilities, employment of certain current employees of Perry County facility under certain conditions, swap agreements prohibited, Secs. 14-2-1, 14-2-8, 14-2-12, 14-2-19, 14-2-21 am'd.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Corrections Institution Finance Authority, issuance of additional bonds to acquire prison facility in Perry County and to provide additional bedspace in existing facilities, employment of certain current employees of Perry County facility under certain conditions, swap agreements prohibited, Secs. 14-2-1, 14-2-8, 14-2-12, 14-2-19, 14-2-21 am'd.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2010-04-22 - Senate - Bedford motion to Concur In and Adopt (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2010-04-22 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 81 N: 16 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2010-04-22 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2010-04-22 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2010-04-22 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2010-04-22 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2010-04-06 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2010-04-06 - Senate - Motion to Adopt (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2010-04-22 Forwarded to Executive Department on April 22, 2010
2010-04-22 Assigned Act No. 2010-729.
2010-04-22 Enrolled
2010-04-22 Signature Requested
2010-04-22 Concurred in Second House Amendment
2010-04-22 Bedford motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 1240
2010-04-22 Concurrence Requested
2010-04-22 Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1150
2010-04-22 Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 1149
2010-04-22 Morrow Amendment Offered
2010-04-22 Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 1148
2010-04-22 DeMarco Amendment Offered
2010-04-22 Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 1147
2010-04-22 Lindsey 2nd Amendment Offered
2010-04-22 Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 1146
2010-04-22 Lindsey 1st Amendment Offered
2010-04-22 Third Reading Passed
2010-04-06 Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 742
2010-04-22 Knight motion to suspend rules to take up out of order
2010-04-21 Knight motion to Carry Over Temporarily adopted Voice Vote
2010-04-14 Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
2010-04-08 Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Government Appropriations
2010-04-21 Third Reading Carried Over
2010-04-08 Engrossed
2010-04-06 Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 741
2010-04-06 Barron first Substitute Offered
2010-04-06 Barron motion to Table adopted Voice Vote
2010-04-06 Finance and Taxation General Fund first Substitute Offered
2010-04-06 Third Reading Passed
2010-03-11 Read for the second time and placed on the calendar with 1 substitute and
2010-02-25 Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Finance and Taxation General Fund

Subjects


Alabama State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/SESSBillResult.ASPX?WIN_TYPE=BillResult&BILL=SB473
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2010RS/PrintFiles/SB473-int.pdf
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2010RS/PrintFiles/SB473-eng.pdf
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2010RS/PrintFiles/SB473-enr.pdf
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=384884&VOTE=741&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1051&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=384885&VOTE=742&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1051&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=392231&VOTE=1146&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1051&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=392270&VOTE=1147&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1051&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=392272&VOTE=1148&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1051&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=392274&VOTE=1149&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1051&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=392295&VOTE=1150&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1051&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=392304&VOTE=1240&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1051&AMDSUB= 

Bill Comments

feedback