AL SB472 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 7 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-09 - Pending third reading on day 30 Favorable from Jefferson County Legislation
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 7 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-09 - Pending third reading on day 30 Favorable from Jefferson County Legislation
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Jefferson Co., alcoholic beverages, sale of wine, business relations between suppliers and wholesalers regulated, Jefferson County Wine Franchise Jobs Protection Act
Title
Jefferson Co., alcoholic beverages, sale of wine, business relations between suppliers and wholesalers regulated, Jefferson County Wine Franchise Jobs Protection Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-05-08 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2013-05-08 - Senate - Motion to Adopt (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2013-05-08 - Senate - Motion to Adopt (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-09 | House | Pending third reading on day 30 Favorable from Jefferson County Legislation |
2013-05-09 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2013-05-07 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Jefferson County Legislation |
2013-05-07 | Senate | Engrossed |
2013-05-07 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 878 |
2013-05-07 | Senate | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 877 |
2013-05-07 | Senate | Local Legislation No. 2 Amendment Offered |
2013-05-07 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2013-05-02 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment |
2013-04-25 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation No. 2 |