AL SB470 | 2013 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 2 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-20 - Died in Conference Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Talladega Co., court costs, Law Library Fund and Juvenile Justice Fund established, use for court personnel, Act 90-430, 1990 Reg. Sess. am'd.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Talladega Co., court costs, Law Library Fund and Juvenile Justice Fund established, use for court personnel, Act 90-430, 1990 Reg. Sess. am'd.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-05-20 - House - Johnson (R) motion to Accede (Y: 81 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2013-05-20 - Senate - Marsh motion to Non Concur and Appoint Conference Committee (Y: 27 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2013-05-09 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 60 Abs: 11) [FAIL]
2013-05-09 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 62 Abs: 8) [FAIL]
2013-05-03 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 23 N: 1 NV: 7 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-05-20SenateDied in Conference Committee
2013-05-20SenateConference Committee Appointed
2013-05-20HouseJohnson (R) motion to Accede adopted Roll Call 1227 House appoints: Johnson (R), Hurst and Boyd
2013-05-20HouseConference Committee Requested
2013-05-20SenateMarsh motion to Non Concur and Appoint Conference Committee adopted Roll Call 1045 P&PO appoints Fielding, Singleton and Whatley
2013-05-20SenateConcurrence Requested
2013-05-09HouseMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1178
2013-05-09HouseMotion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 1177
2013-05-09HouseLocal Legislation Amendment Offered
2013-05-09HouseThird Reading Passed
2013-05-07HouseRead for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment
2013-05-02HouseRead for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Local Legislation
2013-05-02SenateMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 777
2013-05-02SenateThird Reading Passed
2013-04-30SenateRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2013-04-25SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation No. 1

Subjects


Alabama State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/SESSBillResult.ASPX?WIN_TYPE=BillResult&BILL=SB470
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2013RS/PrintFiles/SB470-int.pdf
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=472500&VOTE=777&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1061&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=474354&VOTE=1177&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1061&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=474355&VOTE=1178&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1061&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=475763&VOTE=1045&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1061&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=475906&VOTE=1227&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1061&AMDSUB= 

Bill Comments

feedback