AL SB47 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-04 - Enacted
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-04 - Enacted
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Insurance; motor vehicles; assigned risk plan, department of insurance to issue motor vehicle liability insurance policies; liability waived for the department, its officers and employees, the state.
Title
Insurance; motor vehicles; assigned risk plan, department of insurance to issue motor vehicle liability insurance policies; liability waived for the department, its officers and employees, the state.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-19 - House - Passed Second House (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-19 - House - Third Reading Second House (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-27 - Senate - Passed House Of Origin (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-27 - Senate - Third Reading House of Origin (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-03-19 - House - Third Reading Second House (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-27 - Senate - Passed House Of Origin (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-27 - Senate - Third Reading House of Origin (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-04 | Senate | Enacted |
2024-04-04 | Senate | Enacted |
2024-03-19 | Senate | Delivered to Governor |
2024-03-19 | House | Signature Requested |
2024-03-19 | Senate | Enrolled |
2024-03-19 | Senate | Ready to Enroll |
2024-03-19 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass - Adopted Roll Call 262 |
2024-03-19 | House | Third Reading in Second House |
2024-03-06 | House | Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar |
2024-03-06 | House | Reported Out of Committee Second House |
2024-02-27 | House | Pending House Insurance |
2024-02-27 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House Committee on Insurance |
2024-02-27 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass - Adopted Roll Call 108 |
2024-02-27 | Senate | Third Reading in House of Origin |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Reported Out of Committee House of Origin |
2024-02-06 | Senate | Pending Senate Banking and Insurance |
2024-02-06 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate Committee on Banking and Insurance |
Same As/Similar To
HB141 (Same As) 2024-02-20 - Pending Senate Banking and Insurance