AL SB47 | 2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 2 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-16 - Pending third reading on day 12 Favorable from Constitution, Campaigns and Elections
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Voting, paper ballot as integral part of state's electronic vote counting system, required, Sec. 17-7-23 am'd.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Voting, paper ballot as integral part of state's electronic vote counting system, required, Sec. 17-7-23 am'd.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2022-02-02 - Senate - SBIR: Chambliss motion to Adopt Roll Call 65 (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2022-02-02 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 66 (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2022-02-16HousePending third reading on day 12 Favorable from Constitution, Campaigns and Elections
2022-02-16HouseRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2022-02-03HouseRead for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Constitution, Campaigns and Elections
2022-02-02SenateMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 66
2022-02-02SenateThird Reading Passed
2022-01-18SenateRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2022-01-11SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Governmental Affairs

Same As/Similar To

HB343 (Same As) 2022-03-02 - Pending third reading on day 18 Favorable from Constitution, Campaigns and Elections

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
17723Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Alabama State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback