AL SB47 | 2012 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-16 - Conference Committee on SB47 2012RS first Substitute Offered
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Civil actions, expedited, when damages do not exceed $50,000, Supreme Court to implement rules regarding

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Civil actions, expedited, when damages do not exceed $50,000, Supreme Court to implement rules regarding

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2012-05-17 - Senate - Ward motion to Concur In and Adopt (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-05-16 - House - Jones motion to Concur In and Adopt (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2012-05-16 - House - DeMarco motion to Accede (Y: 85 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2012-05-11 - Senate - Ward motion to Non Concur and Appoint Conference Committee (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2012-05-10 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2012-05-10 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 96 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2012-05-10 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2012-05-04 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2012-05-16 Conference Committee on SB47 2012RS first Substitute Offered
2012-05-16 Forwarded to Governor at 10:13 p.m. on May 16, 2012
2012-05-16 Assigned Act No. 2012-492.
2012-05-16 Signature Requested
2012-05-16 Enrolled
2012-05-16 Concurred in Conference Report
2012-05-16 Jones motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 1576
2012-05-16 Conference Report Concurrence Requested
2012-05-16 Ward motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 1414
2012-05-16 Conference Report
2012-05-16 Conference Committee Appointed
2012-05-16 DeMarco motion to Accede adopted Roll Call 1544 House appoints House appoints Jones, DeMarco and England
2012-05-16 Conference Committee Requested
2012-05-10 Ward motion to Non Concur and Appoint Conference Committee adopted Roll Call 1340 P&PO appoints Bedford, Ward and Whatley
2012-05-10 Concurrence Requested
2012-05-10 Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1490
2012-05-10 Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 1489
2012-05-10 Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 1488
2012-05-10 JUDY 2nd Amendment Offered
2012-05-10 JUDY 1st Amendment Offered
2012-05-10 Third Reading Passed
2012-05-08 Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 2 amendments
2012-05-02 Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Judiciary
2012-05-01 Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 864
2012-05-01 Third Reading Passed
2012-02-23 Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
2012-02-07 Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Judiciary

Subjects


Alabama State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/SESSBillResult.ASPX?WIN_TYPE=BillResult&BILL=SB47
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2012RS/PrintFiles/SB47-int.pdf
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2012RS/PrintFiles/SB47-enr.pdf
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=442692&VOTE=864&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1059&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=448588&VOTE=1488&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1059&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=448592&VOTE=1489&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1059&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=448596&VOTE=1490&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1059&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=448765&VOTE=1340&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1059&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=449829&VOTE=1544&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1059&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=450005&VOTE=1414&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1059&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=450292&VOTE=1576&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1059&AMDSUB= 

Bill Comments

feedback