AL SB467 | 2013 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 20 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-20 - Delivered to Governor at 11:59 p.m. on May 20, 2013
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Alabaster, pretrial diversion program, city authorized to establish

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Alabaster, pretrial diversion program, city authorized to establish

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-05-22 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 23 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2013-05-08 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 7) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-05-20SenateDelivered to Governor at 11:59 p.m. on May 20, 2013
2013-05-20SenateAssigned Act No. 2013-317.
2013-05-20SenateEnrolled
2013-05-20HouseSignature Requested
2013-05-20SenatePassed Second House
2013-05-20HouseMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1278
2013-05-20HouseThird Reading Passed
2013-05-09HouseRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2013-05-07HouseRead for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Shelby County Legislation
2013-05-07SenateMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 886
2013-05-07SenateThird Reading Passed
2013-05-02SenateRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2013-04-25SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation No. 1

Subjects


Alabama State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback