AL SB467 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 1 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-01 - Forwarded to Governor at 1:30 p.m. on April 1, 2010
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 1 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-01 - Forwarded to Governor at 1:30 p.m. on April 1, 2010
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Lawrence Co., court costs, additional levied in circuit, district, and municipal courts on all drug cases charged under Article 5 of Chapter 12 of Title 13A of the Code of Alabama 1975, commencing with Section 13A-12-201, distrib. to county commission for enforcement of drug laws
Title
Lawrence Co., court costs, additional levied in circuit, district, and municipal courts on all drug cases charged under Article 5 of Chapter 12 of Title 13A of the Code of Alabama 1975, commencing with Section 13A-12-201, distrib. to county commission for enforcement of drug laws
Sponsors
Sen. Zeb Little [D] |
Roll Calls
2010-04-01 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 51 Abs: 16) [FAIL]
2010-03-23 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2010-03-23 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 16) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-01 | Forwarded to Governor at 1:30 p.m. on April 1, 2010 | |
2010-04-01 | Assigned Act No. 2010-394. | |
2010-04-01 | Signature Requested | |
2010-04-01 | Enrolled | |
2010-04-01 | Passed Second House | |
2010-04-01 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 765 | |
2010-04-01 | Third Reading Passed | |
2010-03-30 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar | |
2010-03-25 | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Local Legislation | |
2010-03-23 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 553 | |
2010-03-23 | Third Reading Passed | |
2010-03-09 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar | |
2010-03-23 | Third Reading Passed | |
2010-02-23 | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation No. 1 |