AL SB462 | 2014 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-03 - Assigned Act No. 2014-422.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Chilton Co., sales and use tax, co. commission authorized to levy add'l. for hospital, Act 2014-162, 2014 Reg. Sess., repealed and superseded

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Chilton Co., sales and use tax, co. commission authorized to levy add'l. for hospital, Act 2014-162, 2014 Reg. Sess., repealed and superseded

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2014-04-04 - House - Wallace motion to Concur In and Adopt (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2014-04-04 - Senate - Ward motion to Concur In and Adopt (Y: 20 N: 3 NV: 3 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2014-03-19 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 65 Abs: 20) [FAIL]
2014-03-18 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 11) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-04-03HouseAssigned Act No. 2014-422.
2014-04-03HouseSignature Requested
2014-04-03SenateEnrolled
2014-04-03SenateSecond House Concurs in Executive Amendment
2014-04-02HouseWallace motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 1077
2014-04-02HouseHouse of Origin Concurs in Executive Amendment
2014-04-02SenateWard motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 1136
2014-04-02SenateExecutive Amendment Offered
2014-04-02SenateForwarded to Governor
2014-03-20HouseSignature Requested
2014-03-20SenateEnrolled
2014-03-20SenatePassed Second House
2014-03-20HouseMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 909
2014-03-20HouseThird Reading Passed
2014-03-19HouseRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2014-03-18HouseRead for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Local Legislation
2014-03-18SenateMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 812
2014-03-18SenateThird Reading Passed
2014-03-13SenateRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2014-03-11SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation No. 1

Subjects


Alabama State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/SESSBillResult.ASPX?WIN_TYPE=BillResult&BILL=SB462
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2014RS/PrintFiles/SB462-int.pdf
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2014RS/PrintFiles/SB462-enr.pdf
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=494908&VOTE=812&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1062&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=496619&VOTE=909&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1062&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=499337&VOTE=1136&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1062&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=499680&VOTE=1077&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1062&AMDSUB= 

Bill Comments

feedback