AL SB46 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-03-08 - Pending third reading on day 19 Favorable from Health
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Health care providers, nurse practitioners and nurse midwives authorized to sign forms which may be signed by a physician

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Health care providers, nurse practitioners and nurse midwives authorized to sign forms which may be signed by a physician

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-02-27 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-02-27 - Senate - McClendon motion to Adopt (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-08HousePending third reading on day 19 Favorable from Health
2018-03-08HouseRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2018-03-01HouseRead for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Health
2018-02-27SenateEngrossed
2018-02-27SenateMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 529
2018-02-27SenateMcClendon motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 528
2018-02-27SenateHealth and Human Services first Substitute Offered
2018-02-27SenateThird Reading Passed
2018-02-15SenateRead for the second time and placed on the calendar with 1 substitute and
2018-01-09SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Health and Human Services

Subjects


Alabama State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback