AL SB459 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-26 - Forwarded to Governor at 1:45 p.m. on April 26, 2012
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-26 - Forwarded to Governor at 1:45 p.m. on April 26, 2012
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Taxation, payment of taxes through an electronic single point of filing program, no charge, Revenue Department promulgate rules, State and Local Advisory Committee created
Title
Taxation, payment of taxes through an electronic single point of filing program, no charge, Revenue Department promulgate rules, State and Local Advisory Committee created
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-04-26 - Senate - Marsh motion to Concur In and Adopt (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2012-04-25 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2012-04-25 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2012-04-25 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 88 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2012-04-11 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 27 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2012-04-11 - Senate - Blackwell motion to Adopt (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2012-04-11 - Senate - Marsh motion to Adopt (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2012-04-25 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2012-04-25 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2012-04-25 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 88 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2012-04-11 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 27 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2012-04-11 - Senate - Blackwell motion to Adopt (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2012-04-11 - Senate - Marsh motion to Adopt (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-26 | Forwarded to Governor at 1:45 p.m. on April 26, 2012 | |
2012-04-26 | Assigned Act No. 2012-279. | |
2012-04-26 | Signature Requested | |
2012-04-26 | Enrolled | |
2012-04-26 | Concurred in Second House Amendment | |
2012-04-26 | Marsh motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 771 | |
2012-04-26 | Concurrence Requested | |
2012-04-24 | Burdine intended to vote "Yea" | |
2012-04-24 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 966 | |
2012-04-24 | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 965 | |
2012-04-24 | Buskey Amendment Offered | |
2012-04-24 | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 964 | |
2012-04-24 | Commerce and Small Business Amendment Offered | |
2012-04-24 | Third Reading Passed | |
2012-04-12 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment | |
2012-04-10 | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Commerce and Small Business | |
2012-04-10 | Engrossed | |
2012-04-10 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 520 | |
2012-04-10 | Blackwell motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 519 | |
2012-04-10 | Blackwell Amendment Offered | |
2012-04-10 | Third Reading Passed | |
2012-04-10 | Blackwell motion to Carry Over to the Call of the Chair Granted | |
2012-04-10 | Marsh motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 515 | |
2012-04-10 | Banking and Insurance Amendment Offered | |
2012-04-10 | Third Reading Carried Over to Call of the Chair | |
2012-04-05 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment | |
2012-04-03 | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Banking and Insurance |