AL SB454 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 4 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-04 - Assigned Act No. 2015-487.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Colleges, Alabama State University, membership of board of trustees increased, terms decreased from 12 to 6 year terms, nominating committee established, electronic meeting participation provided, compensation, Secs. 16-50-20, 16-50-26, 16-50-28 am'd.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Colleges, Alabama State University, membership of board of trustees increased, terms decreased from 12 to 6 year terms, nominating committee established, electronic meeting participation provided, compensation, Secs. 16-50-20, 16-50-26, 16-50-28 am'd.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-06-04 - Senate - Marsh motion to Concur In and Adopt (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2015-06-04 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2015-06-04 - House - Knight motion to Adopt (Y: 91 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2015-06-04 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 99 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-06-04 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 98 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2015-06-04 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 94 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2015-05-19 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2015-05-19 - Senate - Motion to Adopt (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-06-04SenateAssigned Act No. 2015-487.
2015-06-04HouseSignature Requested
2015-06-04SenateEnrolled
2015-06-04HouseConcurred in Second House Amendment
2015-06-04SenateMarsh motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 1517
2015-06-04SenateConcurrence Requested
2015-06-04HouseMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1283
2015-06-04HouseKnight motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 1282
2015-06-04HouseKnight motion to reconsider EP amendment #1 adopted Voice Vote
2015-06-04HouseMotion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 1281
2015-06-04HouseEP 2nd Amendment Offered
2015-06-04HouseMotion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 1280
2015-06-04HouseEP 1st Amendment Offered
2015-06-04HouseMotion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 1279
2015-06-04HouseEP 3rd Amendment Offered
2015-06-04HouseThird Reading Passed
2015-06-02HouseRead for the second time and placed on the calendar 3 amendments
2015-05-21HouseRead for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Education Policy
2015-05-21SenateEngrossed
2015-05-19SenateMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1065
2015-05-19SenateMotion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 1064
2015-05-19SenateRoss Amendment Offered
2015-05-19SenateThird Reading Passed
2015-05-14SenateRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2015-05-05SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Education and Youth Affairs

Subjects


Alabama State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/SESSBillResult.ASPX?WIN_TYPE=BillResult&BILL=SB454
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2015RS/PrintFiles/SB454-int.pdf
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2015RS/PrintFiles/SB454-eng.pdf
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2015RS/PrintFiles/SB454-enr.pdf
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=519664&VOTE=1064&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1064&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=519668&VOTE=1065&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1064&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=526223&VOTE=1279&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1064&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=526243&VOTE=1280&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1064&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=526244&VOTE=1281&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1064&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=526253&VOTE=1282&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1064&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=526255&VOTE=1283&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1064&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=526781&VOTE=1517&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1064&AMDSUB= 

Bill Comments

feedback