AL SB450 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-16 - Forwarded to Governor at 10:13 p.m. on May 16, 2012
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-16 - Forwarded to Governor at 10:13 p.m. on May 16, 2012
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Labor, merger of Department of Industrial Relations and Department of Labor, Secs. 25-2-1, 25-2-2, 25-2-6, 25-2-7 am'd; Secs. 25-3-1, 25-3-2, 25-3-3, 25-5-4, 25-5-5 repealed
Title
Labor, merger of Department of Industrial Relations and Department of Labor, Secs. 25-2-1, 25-2-2, 25-2-6, 25-2-7 am'd; Secs. 25-3-1, 25-3-2, 25-3-3, 25-5-4, 25-5-5 repealed
Sponsors
Sen. Dick Brewbaker [R] | Sen. Paul Bussman [R] | Sen. Del Marsh [R] | Sen. Arthur Orr [R] |
Sen. Paul Sanford [R] | Sen. J.T. Waggoner [R] |
Roll Calls
2012-05-17 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2012-04-30 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-04-30 - Senate - Sanford motion to Adopt (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-04-30 - Senate - Sanford motion to Adopt (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-04-30 - Senate - Sanford motion to Adopt (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-04-30 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-04-30 - Senate - Sanford motion to Adopt (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-04-30 - Senate - Sanford motion to Adopt (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-04-30 - Senate - Sanford motion to Adopt (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-16 | Forwarded to Governor at 10:13 p.m. on May 16, 2012 | |
2012-05-16 | Assigned Act No. 2012-496. | |
2012-05-16 | Signature Requested | |
2012-05-16 | Enrolled | |
2012-05-16 | Passed Second House | |
2012-05-16 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1562 | |
2012-05-16 | Third Reading Passed | |
2012-05-02 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar | |
2012-04-26 | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on State Government | |
2012-04-26 | Engrossed | |
2012-04-26 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 794 | |
2012-04-26 | Sanford motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 793 | |
2012-04-26 | Sanford Amendment No. 2 Offered. | |
2012-04-26 | Sanford motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 792 | |
2012-04-26 | Sanford Amendment Offered | |
2012-04-26 | Sanford motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 791 | |
2012-04-26 | Governmental Affairs Amendment Offered | |
2012-04-26 | Third Reading Passed | |
2012-04-10 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment | |
2012-03-22 | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Governmental Affairs |