AL SB45 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-05-04 - Transportation and Energy first Substitute Offered
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Crimes and offenses, criminal trespass, unauthorized entry of a critical infrastructure, further provided to include unmanned aircraft systems, Sec. 13A-7-4.3 am'd.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Crimes and offenses, criminal trespass, unauthorized entry of a critical infrastructure, further provided to include unmanned aircraft systems, Sec. 13A-7-4.3 am'd.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-12 - Senate - Ward motion to Adopt (Y: 32 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-12 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 28 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-05-04SenateTransportation and Energy first Substitute Offered
2020-05-04HouseRead for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Transportation, Utilities and Infrastructure
2020-03-12SenateEngrossed
2020-03-12SenateMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 409
2020-03-12SenateWard motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 408
2020-03-12SenateWard first Substitute Offered
2020-03-12SenateWard motion to Table adopted Voice Vote
2020-03-12SenateTransportation and Energy zeroeth Substitute Offered
2020-03-12SenateThird Reading Passed
2020-03-05SenateWard motion to Carry Over to the Call of the Chair adopted Voice Vote
2020-03-05SenateThird Reading Carried Over to Call of the Chair
2020-02-13SenateRead for the second time and placed on the calendar with 1 substitute and
2020-02-04SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Transportation and Energy

Subjects


Alabama State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/Alison/SESSBillStatusResult.aspx?BILL=SB45&WIN_TYPE=SELECTED_STATUS
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2020RS/PrintFiles/SB45-int.pdf
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2020RS/PrintFiles/SB45-eng.pdf
Amendmenthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2020RS/PrintFiles/204961-2.pdf
Amendmenthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2020RS/PrintFiles/206678-1.pdf
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=636887&VOTE=409&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1076&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=636886&VOTE=408&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1076&AMDSUB= 

Bill Comments

feedback