AL SB45 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-16 - Assigned Act No. 2019-261.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Civil procedure, Asbestos Trust Claims Transparency Act, disclosure of all viable asbestos trust claims required, Secs. 6-5-690 to 6-5-696 added.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Civil procedure, Asbestos Trust Claims Transparency Act, disclosure of all viable asbestos trust claims required, Secs. 6-5-690 to 6-5-696 added.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-15 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Senate - Roberts motion to Adopt (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Senate - Roberts motion to Adopt (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-16SenateAssigned Act No. 2019-261.
2019-05-16SenateEnrolled
2019-05-16HouseSignature Requested
2019-05-16SenatePassed Second House
2019-05-15HouseMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 740
2019-05-15HouseThird Reading Passed
2019-05-07HouseRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2019-04-30HouseRead for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Commerce and Small Business
2019-04-30SenateEngrossed
2019-04-30SenateMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 425
2019-04-30SenateRoberts motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 424
2019-04-30SenateRoberts Amendment Offered
2019-04-30SenateRoberts motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 423
2019-04-30SenateJudiciary first Substitute Offered
2019-04-30SenateThird Reading Passed
2019-04-18SenateRead for the second time and placed on the calendar with 1 substitute and
2019-03-05SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Judiciary

Subjects


Alabama State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/Alison/SESSBillStatusResult.aspx?BILL=SB45&WIN_TYPE=SELECTED_STATUS
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2019RS/PrintFiles/SB45-int.pdf
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2019RS/PrintFiles/SB45-eng.pdf
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2019RS/PrintFiles/SB45-enr.pdf
Amendmenthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2019RS/PrintFiles/199427-5.pdf
Amendmenthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2019RS/PrintFiles/199572-1.pdf
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=613846&VOTE=423&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1074&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=613848&VOTE=424&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1074&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=613849&VOTE=425&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1074&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=619813&VOTE=740&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1074&AMDSUB= 

Bill Comments

feedback