AL SB45 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 19 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-19 - Assigned Act No. 2015-3 on 03/19/2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 19 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-19 - Assigned Act No. 2015-3 on 03/19/2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Charter schools, public charter schools authorized, Alabama Public Charter School Commission created, application, accountability, operation, funding, School Choice and Student Opportunity Act
Title
Charter schools, public charter schools authorized, Alabama Public Charter School Commission created, application, accountability, operation, funding, School Choice and Student Opportunity Act
Sponsors
Sen. Del Marsh [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-03-18 - Senate - Marsh motion to Concur In and Adopt (Y: 24 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-18 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 58 N: 41 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-03-18 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 84 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2015-03-18 - House - Collins motion to Table (Y: 64 N: 32 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2015-03-18 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2015-03-18 - House - Collins motion to Table (Y: 73 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2015-03-18 - House - Collins motion to Table (Y: 68 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2015-03-18 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2015-03-18 - House - Collins motion to Table (Y: 66 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2015-03-18 - House - Collins motion to Table (Y: 67 N: 27 NV: 1 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2015-03-18 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 63 N: 30 NV: 3 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2015-03-10 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 22 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-10 - Senate - Holtzclaw motion to Adopt (Y: 31 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-10 - Senate - Singleton motion to Adopt (Y: 9 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2015-03-10 - Senate - Singleton motion to Adopt (Y: 9 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2015-03-10 - Senate - Sanders motion to Adopt (Y: 9 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2015-03-10 - Senate - Sanders motion to Adopt (Y: 9 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2015-03-10 - Senate - Sanders motion to Adopt (Y: 8 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2015-03-10 - Senate - Figures motion to Adopt (Y: 10 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2015-03-10 - Senate - Coleman motion to Adopt (Y: 9 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2015-03-10 - Senate - Marsh motion to Adopt (Y: 29 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-03-10 - Senate - Smitherman motion to Adopt (Y: 10 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2015-03-10 - Senate - Smitherman motion to Adopt (Y: 9 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2015-03-10 - Senate - Marsh motion to Adopt (Y: 28 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-03-10 - Senate - Marsh motion to Adopt (Y: 24 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-03-18 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 58 N: 41 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-03-18 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 84 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2015-03-18 - House - Collins motion to Table (Y: 64 N: 32 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2015-03-18 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2015-03-18 - House - Collins motion to Table (Y: 73 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2015-03-18 - House - Collins motion to Table (Y: 68 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2015-03-18 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2015-03-18 - House - Collins motion to Table (Y: 66 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2015-03-18 - House - Collins motion to Table (Y: 67 N: 27 NV: 1 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2015-03-18 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 63 N: 30 NV: 3 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2015-03-10 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 22 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-10 - Senate - Holtzclaw motion to Adopt (Y: 31 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-10 - Senate - Singleton motion to Adopt (Y: 9 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2015-03-10 - Senate - Singleton motion to Adopt (Y: 9 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2015-03-10 - Senate - Sanders motion to Adopt (Y: 9 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2015-03-10 - Senate - Sanders motion to Adopt (Y: 9 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2015-03-10 - Senate - Sanders motion to Adopt (Y: 8 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2015-03-10 - Senate - Figures motion to Adopt (Y: 10 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2015-03-10 - Senate - Coleman motion to Adopt (Y: 9 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2015-03-10 - Senate - Marsh motion to Adopt (Y: 29 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-03-10 - Senate - Smitherman motion to Adopt (Y: 10 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2015-03-10 - Senate - Smitherman motion to Adopt (Y: 9 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2015-03-10 - Senate - Marsh motion to Adopt (Y: 28 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-03-10 - Senate - Marsh motion to Adopt (Y: 24 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-19 | Senate | Assigned Act No. 2015-3 on 03/19/2015. |
2015-03-19 | House | |
2015-03-19 | House | Signature Requested |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Enrolled |
2015-03-19 | House | Concurred in Second House Amendment |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Marsh motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 174 |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Concurrence Requested |
2015-03-18 | House | Treadaway intended to vote "Nay" |
2015-03-18 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 131 |
2015-03-18 | House | Alexander intended to vote "Yea" |
2015-03-18 | House | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 130 |
2015-03-18 | House | Collins Amendment Offered |
2015-03-18 | House | Collins motion to Table adopted Roll Call 129 |
2015-03-18 | House | Moore (M) Amendment Offered |
2015-03-18 | House | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 128 |
2015-03-18 | House | Coleman-Evans 2nd Amendment Offered |
2015-03-18 | House | Collins motion to Table adopted Roll Call 127 |
2015-03-18 | House | Coleman-Evans 1st Amendment Offered |
2015-03-18 | House | Collins motion to Table adopted Roll Call 126 |
2015-03-18 | House | Melton Amendment Offered |
2015-03-18 | House | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 125 |
2015-03-18 | House | Knight Amendment Offered |
2015-03-18 | House | Collins motion to Table adopted Roll Call 124 |
2015-03-18 | House | Warren Amendment Offered |
2015-03-18 | House | Collins motion to Table adopted Roll Call 123 |
2015-03-18 | House | Drummond Amendment Offered |
2015-03-18 | House | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 122 |
2015-03-18 | House | Education Policy first Substitute Offered |
2015-03-18 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2015-03-12 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar with 1 substitute and |
2015-03-10 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Education Policy |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Engrossed |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Marsh motion to Reconsider and Table adopted Voice Vote |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 34 |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Holtzclaw motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 33 |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Holtzclaw Amendment Offered |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Singleton motion to Adopt Lost Roll Call 32 |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Singleton Amendment Offered |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Singleton motion to Adopt Lost Roll Call 31 |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Singleton Amendment Offered |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Sanders motion to Adopt Lost Roll Call 30 |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Sanders Amendment Offered |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Sanders motion to Adopt Lost Roll Call 29 |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Sanders Amendment Offered |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Sanders motion to Adopt Lost Roll Call 28 |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Sanders Amendment Offered |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Figures motion to Adopt Lost Roll Call 27 |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Figures Amendment Offered |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Marsh motion to Table adopted Voice Vote |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Coleman Amendment Offered |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Coleman motion to Adopt Lost Roll Call 26 |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Coleman Amendment Offered |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Marsh motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 25 |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Marsh Amendment Offered |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Smitherman motion to Adopt Lost Roll Call 24 |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Smitherman Amendment Offered |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Smitherman motion to Adopt Lost Roll Call 23 |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Smitherman Amendment Offered |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Marsh motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 22 |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Marsh Amendment Offered |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Marsh motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 21 |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Education and Youth Affairs second Substitute Offered |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Education and Youth Affairs first Substitute Offered |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2015-03-05 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar with 1 substitute and |
2015-03-03 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Education & Youth Affairs |