AL SB445 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 2 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-09 - Pending third reading on day 29 Favorable from Boards, Agencies and Commissions
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 2 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-09 - Pending third reading on day 29 Favorable from Boards, Agencies and Commissions
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Alabama Boxing and Mixed Martial Arts Act, renamed as Alabama Boxing, Wrestling, and Mixed Martial Arts Act, wrestling included under regulation of Alabama Athletic Commission, Secs. 41-9-1020, 41-9-1021, 41-9-1023, 41-9-1024, 41-9-1028, 41-9-1029, 41-9-1030, 41-9-1032, 41-9-1033, 41-9-1034, 41-9-1035, 41-9-1036, 41-9-1037, 41-9-1038 am'd
Title
Alabama Boxing and Mixed Martial Arts Act, renamed as Alabama Boxing, Wrestling, and Mixed Martial Arts Act, wrestling included under regulation of Alabama Athletic Commission, Secs. 41-9-1020, 41-9-1021, 41-9-1023, 41-9-1024, 41-9-1028, 41-9-1029, 41-9-1030, 41-9-1032, 41-9-1033, 41-9-1034, 41-9-1035, 41-9-1036, 41-9-1037, 41-9-1038 am'd
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-05-04 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-04 - Senate - Allen motion to Adopt (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-05-04 - Senate - Allen motion to Adopt (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-09 | Pending third reading on day 29 Favorable from Boards, Agencies and Commissions | |
2012-05-09 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar | |
2012-05-03 | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Boards, Agencies and Commissions | |
2012-05-02 | Engrossed | |
2012-05-02 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 904 | |
2012-05-02 | Allen motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 903 | |
2012-05-02 | Governmental Affairs Amendment Offered | |
2012-05-02 | Third Reading Passed | |
2012-04-05 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment | |
2012-03-22 | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Governmental Affairs |