AL SB442 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 14 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-14 - Delivered to Governor at 5:05 p.m. on April 14, 2010
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 14 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-14 - Delivered to Governor at 5:05 p.m. on April 14, 2010
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Public School and College Authority, bonds, issuance for new school construction and renovation of existing school facilities in school systems directly impacted by 2005 Base Realignment and Closure, local school districts required to provide dollar for dollar match (2010-20875)
Title
Public School and College Authority, bonds, issuance for new school construction and renovation of existing school facilities in school systems directly impacted by 2005 Base Realignment and Closure, local school districts required to provide dollar for dollar match (2010-20875)
Sponsors
Sen. Lowell Barron [D] | Sen. Roger Bedford [D] | Sen. Tom Butler [R] | Sen. Hinton Mitchem [D] |
Sen. Arthur Orr [R] | Sen. Paul Sanford [R] |
Roll Calls
2010-04-14 - Senate - Butler motion to Concur In and Adopt (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2010-04-14 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2010-04-14 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 87 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2010-04-14 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2010-04-06 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2010-04-06 - Senate - Motion to Adopt (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2010-04-06 - Senate - Motion to Adopt (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2010-04-14 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2010-04-14 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 87 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2010-04-14 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2010-04-06 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2010-04-06 - Senate - Motion to Adopt (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2010-04-06 - Senate - Motion to Adopt (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-14 | Delivered to Governor at 5:05 p.m. on April 14, 2010 | |
2010-04-14 | Assigned Act No. 2010-551. | |
2010-04-14 | Signature Requested | |
2010-04-14 | Enrolled | |
2010-04-14 | Concurred in Second House Amendment | |
2010-04-14 | Butler motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 1111 | |
2010-04-14 | Concurrence Requested | |
2010-04-14 | Mitchell intended tov ote "Yea" | |
2010-04-14 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1084 | |
2010-04-14 | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 1083 | |
2010-04-14 | Lindsey Amendment Offered | |
2010-04-14 | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 1082 | |
2010-04-14 | Education Appropriations first Substitute Offered | |
2010-04-14 | Third Reading Passed | |
2010-04-14 | Guin to suspend rules to take up out of order adopted voice vote | |
2010-04-13 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar with 1 substitute and | |
2010-04-08 | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Education Appropriations | |
2010-04-08 | Engrossed | |
2010-04-06 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 817 | |
2010-04-06 | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 816 | |
2010-04-06 | Butler Amendment Offered | |
2010-04-06 | Third Reading Passed | |
2010-04-06 | Request to Carry Over to the Call of the Chair Granted | |
2010-04-06 | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 794 | |
2010-04-06 | Butler first Substitute Offered | |
2010-04-06 | Third Reading Carried Over to Call of the Chair | |
2010-03-25 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar | |
2010-02-17 | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Finance and Taxation General Fund |