AL SB44 | 2014 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 1 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-01 - Assigned Act No. 2014-376.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Securities Commission, exemption to Secs. 8-6-3 to 8-6-9, inclusive, limited to offerings of securities conducted in state to residents of the state only, new parameters for the investments established, Sec. 8-6-11 am'd.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Securities Commission, exemption to Secs. 8-6-3 to 8-6-9, inclusive, limited to offerings of securities conducted in state to residents of the state only, new parameters for the investments established, Sec. 8-6-11 am'd.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2014-04-02 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2014-01-23 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-01-23 - Senate - Orr motion to Adopt (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-04-01HouseAssigned Act No. 2014-376.
2014-04-01HouseSignature Requested
2014-04-01SenateEnrolled
2014-04-01SenatePassed Second House
2014-04-01HouseMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1004
2014-04-01HouseThird Reading Passed
2014-02-12HouseRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2014-01-30HouseRead for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Financial Services
2014-01-28SenateEngrossed
2014-01-23SenateMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 140
2014-01-23SenateOrr motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 139
2014-01-23SenateFinance and Taxation General Fund first Substitute Offered
2014-01-23SenateThird Reading Passed
2014-01-15SenateRead for the second time and placed on the calendar with 1 substitute and
2014-01-14SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Finance and Taxation General Fund

Subjects


Alabama State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/SESSBillResult.ASPX?WIN_TYPE=BillResult&BILL=SB44
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2014RS/PrintFiles/SB44-int.pdf
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2014RS/PrintFiles/SB44-eng.pdf
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2014RS/PrintFiles/SB44-enr.pdf
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=480787&VOTE=139&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1062&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=480788&VOTE=140&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1062&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=498306&VOTE=1004&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1062&AMDSUB= 

Bill Comments

feedback