AL SB438 | 2010 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 6 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-22 - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass lost Roll Call 1133
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Perry Co., judge of probate, county revenue commissioner, or sheriff, special election for filling vacancies, const. amend.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Perry Co., judge of probate, county revenue commissioner, or sheriff, special election for filling vacancies, const. amend.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2010-04-22 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 20 Abs: 31) [PASS]
2010-04-06 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 12) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2010-04-22 Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass lost Roll Call 1133
2010-04-22 Lost in second house
2010-04-21 Motion to Carry Over Temporarily adopted Voice Vote
2010-04-21 Third Reading Carried Over
2010-04-14 Howard motion to temporarily carried over adopted voice vote
2010-04-13 Howard motion to Carry Over Temporarily adopted Voice Vote
2010-04-13 Third Reading Carried Over
2010-04-08 Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
2010-04-06 Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Local Legislation
2010-04-06 Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 684
2010-04-06 Third Reading Passed
2010-03-25 Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
2010-02-17 Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation No. 1

Subjects


Alabama State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback