AL SB43 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 1 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-01 - Assigned Act No. 2021-165.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 1 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-01 - Assigned Act No. 2021-165.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Emergency Management Agency, shelters, to adopt guidelines for identifying and designating safer place shelters throughout the state
Title
Emergency Management Agency, shelters, to adopt guidelines for identifying and designating safer place shelters throughout the state
Sponsors
Sen. Randy Price [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-01 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 585 (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-04-01 - House - HBIR: Lovvorn motion to Adopt Roll Call 584 (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-02-09 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 111 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-02-09 - Senate - SBIR: Price motion to Adopt Roll Call 110 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-04-01 - House - HBIR: Lovvorn motion to Adopt Roll Call 584 (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-02-09 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 111 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-02-09 - Senate - SBIR: Price motion to Adopt Roll Call 110 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-01 | Senate | Assigned Act No. 2021-165. |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Enrolled |
2021-04-01 | House | Signature Requested |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Passed Second House |
2021-04-01 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 585 |
2021-04-01 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2021-03-11 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2021-02-09 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on State Government |
2021-02-09 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 111 |
2021-02-09 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2021-02-03 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2021-02-02 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Governmental Affairs |
Same As/Similar To
HB143 (Same As) 2021-04-06 - Further Consideration