AL SB43 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-08 - Assigned Act No. 2018-94.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Alabama Disaster Recovery Program, established to assist counties and municipalities with disaster recovery, committee to administer, Sec. 31-9-86 added; Secs. 31-9-10, 31-9-83 am'd.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Alabama Disaster Recovery Program, established to assist counties and municipalities with disaster recovery, committee to administer, Sec. 31-9-86 added; Secs. 31-9-10, 31-9-83 am'd.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-02-06 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-01-23 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2018-01-23 - Senate - Albritton motion to Adopt (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-02-08SenateAssigned Act No. 2018-94.
2018-02-08HouseSignature Requested
2018-02-08SenateEnrolled
2018-02-08SenatePassed Second House
2018-02-06HouseMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 222
2018-02-06HouseThird Reading Passed
2018-02-01HouseRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2018-01-25HouseRead for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Public Safety and Homeland Security
2018-01-23SenateMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 88
2018-01-23SenateAlbritton motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 87
2018-01-23SenateGovernmental Affairs Amendment Offered
2018-01-23SenateThird Reading Passed
2018-01-25SenateEngrossed
2018-01-16SenateRead for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment
2018-01-09SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Governmental Affairs

Subjects


Alabama State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback