AL SB428 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 30 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-03 - Indefinitely Postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 30 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-03 - Indefinitely Postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Court costs, fines and restitution, attachment to certain benefits and the Teachers' Retirement System and the Employees' Retirement System, suspension of licenses for failure to pay, payment procedures revised, amnesty, Secs. 16-25-23, 36-27-28 am'd.
Title
Court costs, fines and restitution, attachment to certain benefits and the Teachers' Retirement System and the Employees' Retirement System, suspension of licenses for failure to pay, payment procedures revised, amnesty, Secs. 16-25-23, 36-27-28 am'd.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-03 | Senate | Indefinitely Postponed |
2015-05-28 | Senate | Albritton motion to Carry Over to the Call of the Chair adopted Voice Vote |
2015-05-28 | Senate | Third Reading Carried Over to Call of the Chair |
2015-05-19 | Senate | Albritton motion to Carry Over adopted Voice Vote |
2015-05-19 | Senate | Judiciary first Substitute Offered |
2015-05-19 | Senate | Third Reading Carried Over |
2015-05-14 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar with 1 substitute and |
2015-04-30 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Judiciary |