AL SB427 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 11 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-07 - Indefinitely Postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 11 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-07 - Indefinitely Postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Heating and Air Conditioning Contractors, Board of, additonal requirements regarding system filter replacement, duct cleaning, testing duct tightness, definition of terms, fees, classroom training, Secs. 34-31-18, 34-31-20, 34-31-21, 34-31-24, 34-31-25 am'd.
Title
Heating and Air Conditioning Contractors, Board of, additonal requirements regarding system filter replacement, duct cleaning, testing duct tightness, definition of terms, fees, classroom training, Secs. 34-31-18, 34-31-20, 34-31-21, 34-31-24, 34-31-25 am'd.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-26 - Senate - Whatley to table Smitherman motion to recommit (Y: 20 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-07 | Senate | Indefinitely Postponed |
2013-04-25 | Senate | Whatley to table Smitherman motion to recommit adopted Roll Call 565 |
2013-04-25 | Senate | Smitherman motion to recommit |
2013-04-25 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Small Business |