AL SB427 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on June 9 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-09 - Delivered to Governor at 11:45 on June 9, 2011
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on June 9 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-09 - Delivered to Governor at 11:45 on June 9, 2011
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Infants, sudden unexplained infant death, Sudden Unexplained Infant Death Investigation Team, established, duties, coordination of county officials, law enforcement, medical or emergency personnel, immunity, Sudden Unexplained Infant Death Investigation Act
Title
Infants, sudden unexplained infant death, Sudden Unexplained Infant Death Investigation Team, established, duties, coordination of county officials, law enforcement, medical or emergency personnel, immunity, Sudden Unexplained Infant Death Investigation Act
Sponsors
Sen. Linda Coleman-Madison [D] | Sen. Vivian Figures [D] | Sen. Tammy Irons [D] | Sen. Hank Sanders [D] |
Sen. Bobby Singleton [D] | Sen. Rodger Smitherman [D] |
Roll Calls
2011-06-09 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-05-31 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2011-05-31 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-09 | Delivered to Governor at 11:45 on June 9, 2011 | |
2011-06-09 | Assigned Act No. 2011-705. | |
2011-06-09 | Signature Requested | |
2011-06-09 | Enrolled | |
2011-06-09 | Passed Second House | |
2011-06-09 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1175 | |
2011-06-09 | Third Reading Passed | |
2011-06-01 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar | |
2011-05-31 | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Health | |
2011-05-31 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 821 | |
2011-05-31 | Third Reading Passed | |
2011-05-25 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar | |
2011-04-21 | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Health |