AL SB421 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 27 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-01 - Indefinitely Postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 27 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-01 - Indefinitely Postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Crime Victims Compensation Commission, definition of funeral expenses and work loss, payments to victims, administrative expense of commission, Secs. 15-23-3, 15-23-5, 15-23-15 am'd.
Title
Crime Victims Compensation Commission, definition of funeral expenses and work loss, payments to victims, administrative expense of commission, Secs. 15-23-3, 15-23-5, 15-23-15 am'd.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-01 | Senate | Indefinitely Postponed |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Taylor motion to Carry Over adopted Voice Vote |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Third Reading Carried Over |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Judiciary |