AL SB42 | 2022 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 30 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-30 - Assigned Act No. 2022-228.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Property, homeowner's associations and condominium associations, prohibited from restricting display of state flag

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Property, homeowner's associations and condominium associations, prohibited from restricting display of state flag

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2022-03-29 - Senate - Elliott motion to Concur In and Adopt Roll Call 762 (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-17 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 678 (Y: 90 N: 1 NV: 8 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-03-17 - House - Motion to Adopt Roll Call 677 (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-17 - House - HBIR: South motion to Adopt Roll Call 676 (Y: 94 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-01 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 49 (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-02-01 - Senate - SBIR: Elliott motion to Adopt Roll Call 48 (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2022-03-30SenateAssigned Act No. 2022-228.
2022-03-30HouseSignature Requested
2022-03-30SenateEnrolled
2022-03-29HouseConcurred in Second House Amendment
2022-03-29SenateElliott motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 762
2022-03-29SenateConcurrence Requested
2022-03-17HouseMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 678
2022-03-17HouseMotion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 677
2022-03-17HouseSouth Amendment Offered
2022-03-17HouseThird Reading Passed
2022-02-09HouseRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2022-02-02HouseRead for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on County and Municipal Government
2022-02-01SenateMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 49
2022-02-01SenateThird Reading Passed
2022-01-18SenateRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2022-01-11SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Governmental Affairs

Subjects


Alabama State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/Alison/SESSBillStatusResult.aspx?BILL=SB42&WIN_TYPE=SELECTED_STATUS
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2022RS/PrintFiles/SB42-int.pdf
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2022RS/PrintFiles/SB42-enr.pdf
Amendmenthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2022RS/PrintFiles/219222-1.pdf
Supplementhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2022RS/FiscalNotes/FN-43342.htm
Supplementhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2022RS/FiscalNotes/FN-43600.htm
Supplementhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2022RS/FiscalNotes/FN-44561.htm
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=671159&VOTE=48&BODY=S&INST=SBIR%20for%20SB42&SESS=1079
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=671161&VOTE=49&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1079&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=683832&VOTE=676&BODY=H&INST=HBIR%20for%20SB42&SESS=1079
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=683839&VOTE=677&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1079&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=683840&VOTE=678&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1079&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=685027&VOTE=762&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1079&AMDSUB= 

Bill Comments

feedback