AL SB42 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 19 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-19 - Delivered to Governor at 10:40 a.m. on March 19, 2015
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 19 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-19 - Delivered to Governor at 10:40 a.m. on March 19, 2015
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Millbrook in Elmore and Autauga Co., alcoholic beverages, Sunday sales, draft beer, exceptions
Title
Millbrook in Elmore and Autauga Co., alcoholic beverages, Sunday sales, draft beer, exceptions
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-19 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 51 Abs: 15) [FAIL]
2015-03-17 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2015-03-17 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-19 | Senate | Delivered to Governor at 10:40 a.m. on March 19, 2015 |
2015-03-19 | House | Assigned Act No. 2015-17. |
2015-03-19 | House | Signature Requested |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Enrolled |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Passed Second House |
2015-03-19 | House | Beckman intended to vote "Yea" |
2015-03-19 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 143 |
2015-03-19 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2015-03-18 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2015-03-17 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Local Legislation |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 75 |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2015-03-03 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation |