AL SB419 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-29 - Assigned Act No. 2019-436.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-29 - Assigned Act No. 2019-436.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Morgan Co., T.V.A. distribution of designated portion under Act 2010-135, distrib until fiscal year commencing October 1, 2021, use of any remaining funds further provided
Title
Morgan Co., T.V.A. distribution of designated portion under Act 2010-135, distrib until fiscal year commencing October 1, 2021, use of any remaining funds further provided
Sponsors
Sen. Arthur Orr [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-29 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 76 Abs: 10) [FAIL]
2019-05-23 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-29 | Senate | Assigned Act No. 2019-436. |
2019-05-29 | Senate | Enrolled |
2019-05-29 | House | Signature Requested |
2019-05-29 | Senate | Passed Second House |
2019-05-29 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1121 |
2019-05-29 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2019-05-28 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2019-05-23 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Local Legislation |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1024 |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation |