AL SB419 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 7 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-05-07 - Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Local Legislation
Pending: House Local Legislation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 7 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-05-07 - Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Local Legislation
Pending: House Local Legislation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Lamar Co., increase special recording and indexing fees, judge of probate shall collect fee, Act 93-491, 1993 Reg. Sess., am'd.
Title
Lamar Co., increase special recording and indexing fees, judge of probate shall collect fee, Act 93-491, 1993 Reg. Sess., am'd.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-05-08 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2013-04-26 - Senate - Whatley to table Smitherman motion to recommit (Y: 18 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2013-04-26 - Senate - Whatley to table Smitherman motion to recommit (Y: 18 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-07 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Local Legislation |
2013-05-07 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 875 |
2013-05-07 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2013-04-25 | Senate | Whatley to table Smitherman motion to recommit adopted Roll Call 566 |
2013-04-25 | Senate | Smitherman motion to recommit |
2013-04-25 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation No. 1 |