AL SB419 | 2011 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 9 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-09 - Delivered to Governor at 11:58 on June 9, 2011
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Public Education Employees' Health Insurance Plan (PEEHIP), employees retiring after December 31, 2011, subject to sliding scale premium calculation based on years of service and difference between age of employee at retirement and Medicare entitlement age, limit on employer contribution based on other health insurance of spouse, false information basis for disqualification of coverage, employer contribution for non-Medicare retiree not to exceed contribution for active employee, Secs. 16-25A-1, 16-25A-8.1, 16-25A-17.1, 16-25A-20, 16-25A-22 am'd. (2011-20825)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public Education Employees' Health Insurance Plan (PEEHIP), employees retiring after December 31, 2011, subject to sliding scale premium calculation based on years of service and difference between age of employee at retirement and Medicare entitlement age, limit on employer contribution based on other health insurance of spouse, false information basis for disqualification of coverage, employer contribution for non-Medicare retiree not to exceed contribution for active employee, Secs. 16-25A-1, 16-25A-8.1, 16-25A-17.1, 16-25A-20, 16-25A-22 am'd. (2011-20825)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2011-06-09 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 60 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2011-05-24 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 21 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-05-24 - Senate - Motion to Adopt (Y: 21 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-05-24 - Senate - Rules Petition to Cease Debate (Y: 21 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-05-24 - Senate - Marsh motion to Table (Y: 21 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-05-24 - Senate - Marsh motion to Table (Y: 21 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-05-24 - Senate - Marsh motion to Table (Y: 20 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-05-24 - Senate - Marsh motion to Table (Y: 20 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2011-06-09 Delivered to Governor at 11:58 on June 9, 2011
2011-06-09 Assigned Act No. 2011-704.
2011-06-09 Boyd, Lindsey, Hall, Todd and Black intended to vote "Nay"
2011-06-09 Signature Requested
2011-06-09 Enrolled
2011-06-09 Passed Second House
2011-06-09 Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1189
2011-06-09 Third Reading Passed
2011-05-31 Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
2011-05-25 Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Ways and Means Education
2011-05-24 Engrossed
2011-05-24 Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 685
2011-05-24 Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 684
2011-05-24 Rules Petition to Cease Debate adopted Roll Call 683.
2011-05-24 Marsh first Substitute Offered
2011-05-24 Marsh motion to Table adopted Roll Call 682
2011-05-24 Finance and Taxation General Fund Amendment Offered
2011-05-24 Marsh motion to Table adopted Roll Call 681
2011-05-24 Finance and Taxation General Fund Amendment Offered
2011-05-24 Marsh motion to Table adopted Roll Call 680
2011-05-24 Finance and Taxation General Fund Amendment Offered
2011-05-24 Marsh motion to Table adopted Roll Call 679
2011-05-24 Finance and Taxation General Fund Amendment Offered
2011-05-24 Marsh motion to Table adopted Voice Vote
2011-05-24 Finance and Taxation General Fund Amendment Offered
2011-05-24 Third Reading Passed
2011-04-21 Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 5 amendments
2011-04-19 Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Finance and Taxation General Fund

Subjects


Alabama State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/SESSBillResult.ASPX?WIN_TYPE=BillResult&BILL=SB419
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2011RS/PrintFiles/SB419-int.pdf
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2011RS/PrintFiles/SB419-eng.pdf
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2011RS/PrintFiles/SB419-enr.pdf
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=413005&VOTE=679&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1058&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=413006&VOTE=680&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1058&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=413007&VOTE=681&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1058&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=413008&VOTE=682&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1058&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=413070&VOTE=683&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1058&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=413030&VOTE=684&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1058&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=413032&VOTE=685&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1058&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=422285&VOTE=1189&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1058&AMDSUB= 

Bill Comments

feedback