AL SB415 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 17 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-17 - Delivered to Governor at 4:08 p.m. on April 17, 2012
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 17 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-17 - Delivered to Governor at 4:08 p.m. on April 17, 2012
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Marshall Co., district attorney, appointment of investigators pursuant to Act 87-531, Act 87-531, 1987 Reg. Sess. repealed
Title
Marshall Co., district attorney, appointment of investigators pursuant to Act 87-531, Act 87-531, 1987 Reg. Sess. repealed
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-04-17 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 54 Abs: 30) [FAIL]
2012-04-10 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2012-04-10 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-17 | Delivered to Governor at 4:08 p.m. on April 17, 2012 | |
2012-04-17 | Assigned Act No. 2012-228. | |
2012-04-17 | Signature Requested | |
2012-04-17 | Enrolled | |
2012-04-17 | Passed Second House | |
2012-04-17 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 785 | |
2012-04-17 | Third Reading Passed | |
2012-04-12 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar | |
2012-04-10 | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Local Legislation | |
2012-04-10 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 505 | |
2012-04-10 | Third Reading Passed | |
2012-04-05 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar | |
2012-03-15 | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation No. 1 |