AL SB414 | 2016 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 21 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-04 - Conference Committee Appointed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Russellville, Franklin Co., civil service board, members, salary to be set by city council, Sec. 45-30A-50.03 am'd.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Russellville, Franklin Co., civil service board, members, salary to be set by city council, Sec. 45-30A-50.03 am'd.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-05-04 - House - Morrow motion to Accede (Y: 86 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2016-05-04 - Senate - Marsh motion to Non Concur and Appoint Conference Committee (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2016-05-04 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 80 Abs: 13) [FAIL]
2016-05-04 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 83 Abs: 13) [FAIL]
2016-04-21 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-05-04SenateConference Committee Appointed
2016-05-04HouseMorrow motion to Accede adopted Roll Call 869 House appoints Morrow, Black and Johnson (K)
2016-05-04HouseConference Committee Requested
2016-05-04SenateMarsh motion to Non Concur and Appoint Conference Committee adopted Roll Call 979 P&PO appoints Stutts, Singleton and Albritton
2016-05-04SenateConcurrence Requested
2016-05-04HouseMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 838
2016-05-04HouseMotion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 837
2016-05-04HouseLocal Legislation Amendment Offered
2016-05-04HouseThird Reading Passed
2016-05-03HouseRead for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment
2016-04-21HouseRead for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Local Legislation
2016-04-21SenateMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 777
2016-04-21SenateThird Reading Passed
2016-04-21SenateStutts motion to Carry Over to the Call of the Chair adopted Voice Vote
2016-04-21SenateThird Reading Carried Over to Call of the Chair
2016-04-20SenateStutts motion to Carry Over to the Call of the Chair adopted Voice Vote
2016-04-20SenateThird Reading Carried Over to Call of the Chair
2016-04-19SenateRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2016-04-13SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation

Subjects


Alabama State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/SESSBillResult.ASPX?WIN_TYPE=BillResult&BILL=SB414
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2016RS/PrintFiles/SB414-int.pdf
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=548503&VOTE=777&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1065&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=551739&VOTE=837&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1065&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=551841&VOTE=838&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1065&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=551897&VOTE=979&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1065&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=552205&VOTE=869&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1065&AMDSUB= 

Bill Comments

feedback